Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 1042 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31692 Week
» 130337 Month
» 333001 Year
» 3359854 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2462 |
on |
01/10/1936 |
British Railways |
42462 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 01/10/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/05/1966 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/10/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2462 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42462 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
04/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
14/05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42462 |
|
|
08/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|