Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3088 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33738 Week
» 132383 Month
» 335047 Year
» 3361900 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2449 |
on |
24/06/1936 |
British Railways |
42449 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 24/06/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/11/1964 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/03/1963 |
Carlisle Canal MPD (Stored) |
Stored at Carlisle Canal-42067/98, 42449, 42720/52/5, 42835/6, 43045/139, 47520, 61064, 64499, 64877/8/95/9, 65237 an 69155. |
SLS/196304 |
29/04/1963 |
Coventry (Stored) |
On 29th April a Cathedral special from Newcastle was worked throughout by Peak D192 (52A) instead of the usual V2; three of latter class failed on similar specials during April. On lst May, 70035 (40B) worked a special evening coke train from Coventry Gas Works to Immingham. Commencing April, a twice weekly car train is scheduled to run between the new Rootes factory at Linwood and the Rootes factory at Coventry; the trains run to Gosford Green goods station (Coventry avoiding line) arriving at 3-45 a.m. and are worked throughout by two Polmadie Type 1 d/es which then run to Rugby, l.e., and return from Gosford Green at 5 p.m. Since running, D8119-8128 have all been noted on this turn. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/06/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2449 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42449 |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxenholme (11C) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
13/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42449 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|