09/07/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40187, 575, 614, 40670, 40914, 1138, 42416/18, 42751, 42830, 2875, 42912/14, 4011, 4198, 44234, 4881/86/99, 44900/31/77, 45008, 45120/55/60/65/66/70/92, 45423, 5432, 45452/61/89, 45577/84, 45643, 15141/89, 15211/37, 55356, 16162, 16247/75/95, 56359, 17282, 17411, 17554, 57619, 17625/67. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. |
SLS/194908 |
15/05/1954 |
Bangor MPD |
Much to the shed-master's chagrin, no L.N.W.R. 'old stagers' remain. The 'coal tank' has gone to Monument Lane, the 'Cauliflower' to Stoke-on-Trent, and the 2-4-2 tank to Crewe. The Amlwch branch is entirely worked by Ivatt 2-6-2 tanks, of which Bangor has Nos. 41200, 41212, 41223, an 41233. Periodic loads of iron pyrites are worked over the branch to the Associated Ethyl Corporation Works at Amlwch Port. The load for the 2-6-2 tanks was scheduled for 20 loaded wagons, but has had to be reduced to 16. A number of Fairburn and Stanier 2-6-4 tanks, which have been at Bangor for some time, have recently departed to Greenock, and from the latter shed two of the parallel boiler Fowler type have been received in exchange, Nos. 42415/6. The present L.Y.R. contingent, employed on shunting at Menai Bridge Sidings, local trips and on the Bangor Harbour branch, comprised Nos. 52219, 52269/70. The only L.N.W.R. locomotive seen at Bangor was No. 49416 of 8D, which had arrived the previous day with a load of sleepers. The other 'visitors' were No. 45595 of 9A and one of the inevitable 'Austerity' 2-8-0's from Mold Junction. |
SLS/195407 |
31/10/1959 |
Chester Northgate MPD |
Chester Northgate (6D) now has an allocation of 10 2-car diesel sets. The final steam allocation was 41215/323, 42303/17/416/7, 75030/52, 84001. Some freight turns are now being worked by Northwich whilst Chester 6A has acquired 46472 (ex N.E.R.) to cover a Northgate turn. |
SLS/196003 |
15/12/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. |
SLS/196201 |
04/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. |
SLS/196202 |
16/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Paint Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. |
SLS/196202 |
04/12/1963 |
Saltley MPD |
Of the Fowler 2-6-4Ts, 42419 was condemned 4th December, 42417 is waiting works (?) leaving 42400/16/21 in traffic, although Drivers complain they have inadequate brake power on goods trains. 46505/26/9 have arrived, the latter two green; some Class 4Fs are to come out of store, probably for Bescot in lieu of LNW Super Ds. |
SLS/196401 |