Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1100 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3745 Week
» 6327 Month
» 270960 Year
» 1492525 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2683 on 23/06/1945
BR 42683 w/e 17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 23/06/1945
Withdrawal Sat 07/10/1961
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 16 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 23/06/1945
14B Kentish Town 01/01/1948
5D Stoke 5w/e 16/07/1949
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 8w/e 14/06/1952
   Withdrawn 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 12/07/1947
LOAN 5D Stoke w/e 02/07/1949
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1946 First D40 withdrawn 6914 was the first locomotive of its class to be withdrawn, SLS/194605
15/04/1946 Midland Section 4825 has been fitted with a self-cleaning smoke-box (15/4). 2683 (26A) was noted at Wellingborough, running light, on 20/3. An interesting working for which Bedford shed is responsible is a trip to Gloucester. The route is via Northampton and Stratford, and the locomotive, usually a 3F, is due out at 3 a.m, and does not re-turn until late at night. SLS/194605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/06/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2683
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
17/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42683    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42683    

prev prev