Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 127 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6103 Week
» 12237 Month
» 240121 Year
» 1461686 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2682 on 18/06/1945
BR 42682 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 18/06/1945
Withdrawal Sat 25/07/1964
Scrapping During 09/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 18/06/1945
20E Manningham 01/01/1948
14B Kentish Town 4w/e 06/11/1954
14E Bedford w/e 21/05/1960
27C Southport w/e 03/08/1963
   Withdrawn 25/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 20E Manningham 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 14E Bedford 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 03/08/1963
WDN   w/e 25/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/06/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2682
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (20E)    
08/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42682    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (14E)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
25/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42682    

prev prev