Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 683 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8137 Week
» 10719 Month
» 275352 Year
» 1496917 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2681 on 09/06/1945
BR 42681 w/e 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 09/06/1945
Withdrawal Sat 29/06/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 18 yrs , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 09/06/1945
14C St Albans on 01/01/1948
13A Plaistow 3w/e 11/12/1948
PLS Plaistow m/e 30/11/1949
91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 24/12/1949
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 15/12/1956
6A Chester (MR) w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn on 29/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 14C St Albans 4w/e 27/04/1946
LOAN 20E Manningham 4w/e 27/04/1946
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 11/12/1948
EXLOAN 14C St Albans w/e 19/02/1949
LOAN 13A Plaistow on 06/12/1949
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 3w/e 01/12/1956
REINS 91M To London Midland Region on 17/06/1962
WDN   on 18/06/1962
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/06/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2681
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Albans (14C)    
30/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42681    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (13A)    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (PLS)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
29/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42681    

prev prev