Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 263 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7270 Week
» 13404 Month
» 241288 Year
» 1462853 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2675 on 17/04/1945
BR 42675 w/e 29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 17/04/1945
Withdrawal Sat 18/09/1965
Scrapping During 03/1966
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 17/04/1945
5D Stoke 01/01/1948
5F Uttoxeter 4w/e 05/09/1953
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 05/11/1955
8P Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 08/02/1964
8M Southport w/e 18/04/1964
   Withdrawn 18/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 5F Uttoxeter 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 8P Wigan Central (L&Y) 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 8M Southport 4w/e 02/05/1964
WDN   w/e 18/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2675
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
29/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42675    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
08/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (8P)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
18/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42675    

prev prev