Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 130 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6106 Week
» 12240 Month
» 240124 Year
» 1461689 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2294 on 13/11/1947
BR 42294 w/e 22/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 13/11/1947
Withdrawal Sat 18/05/1963
Scrapping During 06/1963
Service Life 15 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 13/11/1947
23C Southport 01/01/1948
24A Accrington 4w/e 22/03/1952
24E Blackpool Central w/e 04/03/1961
   Withdrawn 18/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 23C Southport w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 04/03/1961
WDN   w/e 18/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop Yard) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2294
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
22/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42294    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
18/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42294    

prev prev