Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 218 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7225 Week
» 13359 Month
» 241243 Year
» 1462808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2293 on 07/11/1947
BR 42293 w/e 22/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 07/11/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/04/1963
Scrapping Sat 29/06/1963
Service Life 15 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 07/11/1947
23C Southport 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 06/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 23C Southport w/e 08/11/1947
WDN   w/e 06/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/01/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay) Paint Shop: M.R.1000, 43911 I, 44274 G, 48097 G, 48205 I, 75054 I. Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12097/8, 13090, D5004, D8209. New Work: 6 D-E Sh., 0-6-0 (D3937-D3942). Test House: D5068/9/70. Diesel Finishing Shop: D7/10, D5016/71/2. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42394 G, 42502/13 G, 43342/682 I, 44098/381 G, 47377/429/45 G, 48181 I, 48355 G, 48382/436 I, 48607 G, 75051/61/4 I, Str., 48338/545. Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay: 42315 G, 42533 I, 44160 I, 73133/4 (Cas.) Str., 42293, 43832. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: D1, 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E (D5073-81). 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E (D11-D14). Yard: 40413. 41763, 42354, 43370, 43531/828, 47309/67, 48387/424, 10100/800, D4/5/6/9, D5014. SLS/196002
11/02/1960 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop-MR1000, 42293 I, 42513 I, 44223 I, 48079 I. Diesel Erecting Shop-10000, 12074/5/98, 13173, D2220, D2901, D8012, ED4/6. New Work-6 diesel shunters D3937-3942 New. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay -42053 I, 42152 I, 42372 G, 43903 I, 43967 G, 44203/7 I, 44222 G, 44509 I, 47287 G, 47469 G, 47596 G, 47648 I, 48187 G, 48413/7 G, 73070 G, 75038 I, 80092 G. Stripping-42340, 42516, 43410; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay: 8 d/e shunters D3943-49/51, 42540 Casual, 42396 Stripping; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-10100 Cut, D5014 Damage repairs, 10 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. d/e (D5075-84), 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. d/e. Test House-D10, D5072. Diesel Finishing Shop-D5015, D5073/4, D5716. Yard-40025, 40413/582/654, 42387, 43256/428/510/31/665/759, 43933/7/95, 44158/344/55/510, 47238, 47609, 48098/9, 58219/61, 92135, D4, D5, D6. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/11/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2293
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
22/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42293    
06/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42293    

prev prev