Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1155 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 5970 Week
» 12104 Month
» 239988 Year
» 1461553 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2292 on 03/11/1947
BR 42292 w/e 01/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 03/11/1947
Withdrawal Sat 16/05/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 16 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 03/11/1947
23C Southport 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 16/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 23C Southport w/e 08/11/1947
LOAN 26C Bolton w/e 07/02/1948
EXLOAN 23C Southport w/e 14/02/1948
WDN   w/e 16/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/11/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2292
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
01/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42292    
16/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42292    

prev prev