Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 233 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7240 Week
» 13374 Month
» 241258 Year
» 1462823 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2291 on 28/10/1947
BR 42291 w/e 12/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 28/10/1947
Withdrawal Sat 26/12/1964
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 17 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 28/10/1947
23C Southport 01/01/1948
14D Neasden 4w/e 04/10/1958
17C Rowsley w/e 30/06/1962
2F Woodford Halse w/e 14/07/1962
17C Rowsley w/e 18/08/1962
16C Derby w/e 02/05/1964
   Withdrawn 26/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 23C Southport w/e 01/11/1947
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 01/09/1962
ALLOC 16C Derby 4w/e 02/05/1964
WDN   3w/e 05/10/1964
WDN   w/e 26/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/10/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2291
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
12/08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42291    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
18/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
26/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42291    

prev prev