Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 32 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6008 Week
» 12142 Month
» 240026 Year
» 1461591 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2290 on 21/10/1947
BR 42290 w/e 09/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 21/10/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/09/1962
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 14 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 21/10/1947
26A Newton Heath 01/01/1948
27C Southport 4w/e 10/08/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 29/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   w/e 29/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2290
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
09/09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42290    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
29/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42290    

prev prev