Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 12 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 5988 Week
» 12122 Month
» 240006 Year
» 1461571 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2233 on 25/06/1946
BR 42233 w/e 23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sun 25/06/1946
Withdrawal During 05/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 25/06/1946
5D Stoke 01/01/1948
6H Bangor 4w/e 17/07/1954
5D Stoke 4w/e 09/10/1954
2A Rugby 4w/e 28/12/1957
11B Workington 4w/e 14/06/1958
11A Barrow in Furness 4w/e 06/09/1958
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/10/1960
65C Parkhead w/e 04/02/1961
65C Parkhead 4w/e 11/02/1961
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 11/11/1961
2E Northampton w/e 26/05/1962
1C Watford w/e 12/12/1964
1A Willesden w/e 03/04/1965
6A Chester (MR) w/e 26/06/1965
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 21/08/1965
8M Southport w/e 27/11/1965
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/06/1966
56A Wakefield w/e 12/11/1966
56A Wakefield 4w/e 03/12/1966
56F Low Moor 4w/e 31/12/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5D Stoke w/e 26/07/1947
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 23/08/1947
LOAN 6H Bangor 4w/e 10/07/1954
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/12/1957
LOAN 9A Longsight 4w/e 22/02/1958
EXLOAN 9A Longsight 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 11B Workington 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 29/10/1960
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 65C Parkhead 4w/e 11/02/1961
ALLOC 2E Northampton 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 1C Watford 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 1A Willesden 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 12C Barrow in Furness 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 8M Southport 4w/e 04/12/1965
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 09/07/1966
ALLOC 91NE   5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   27/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1961 Saltley MPD 2-6-4Ts transferred here on connection with temporary steam trains on Leicester line are 42082, 42146, 42181, 42225/33. SLS/196201
12/08/1964 Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. SLS/196409
20/09/1964 Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. SLS/196410
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Paint shop area) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/06/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2233
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
23/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42233    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (11B)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
04/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
11/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
11/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
26/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
12/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
27/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42233    

prev prev