Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 35 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6011 Week
» 12145 Month
» 240029 Year
» 1461594 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2232 on 12/06/1946
BR 42232 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 12/06/1946 to Southport (23C)
Withdrawal Sat 29/01/1966
Scrapping During 05/1966
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
23C Southport (New) 12/06/1946
5D Stoke 01/01/1948
14C St Albans 3w/e 11/12/1948
PLS Plaistow m/e 30/11/1949
34E Neasden 5w/e 23/04/1955
16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 18/11/1961
12E Tebay w/e 31/10/1964
   Withdrawn 29/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5D Stoke w/e 26/07/1947
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 23/08/1947
LOAN 14C St Albans w/e 11/12/1948
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 22/01/1949
LOAN 14C St Albans w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 14C St Albans w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 29/10/1949
LOAN 13A Plaistow 06/12/1949
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 23/04/1955
LOAN 14D Neasden 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 23/02/1958
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 12E Tebay 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 29/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/06/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2232
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Southport (23C)
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
06/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42232    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to St Albans (14C)    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (PLS)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
31/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
29/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42232    

prev prev