Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 114 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 13255 Month
» 241139 Year
» 1462704 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2231 on 05/06/1946
BR 42231 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 05/06/1946 to Southport (23C)
Withdrawal Sat 22/06/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 17 yrs , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
23C Southport (New) 05/06/1946
5D Stoke 01/01/1948
14C St Albans 3w/e 11/12/1948
PLS Plaistow m/e 30/11/1949
34E Neasden 4w/e 19/02/1955
16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 18/11/1961
   Withdrawn 22/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5D Stoke w/e 26/07/1947
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 23/08/1947
LOAN 14C St Albans w/e 11/12/1948
ALLOC 14C St Albans w/e 23/07/1949
LOAN 13A Plaistow 25/11/1949
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 29/01/1955
LOAN 14D Neasden 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 23/02/1958
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   w/e 22/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/06/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2231
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Southport (23C)
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42231    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to St Albans (14C)    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (PLS)    
19/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
22/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42231    

prev prev