Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 23 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7030 Week
» 13164 Month
» 241048 Year
» 1462613 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 42132 on 28/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 28/12/1949 to St Albans (14C)
Withdrawal Sat 18/06/1966
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 16 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
14C St Albans (New) 28/12/1949
16A Nottingham 4w/e 27/02/1954
20G Hellifield 4w/e 24/03/1956
27C Southport w/e 17/06/1961
8K Bank Hall w/e 11/06/1966
   Withdrawn 18/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 14C St Albans w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 20G Hellifield 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 5w/e 11/06/1966
WDN   w/e 18/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40324/95, 430, 40459, 634, 40741, 41094, 41113/66/74/81/88, 1682, 1768, 1847/59, 42310, 2341/80, 42412, 42512/23/24/28/29, 42680, 3140/44, 3244, 3323/36/64, 3431, 3509, 43524, 3529/94, 3658, 3723/37, 3847, 43917, 3926/44/50, 43964/95, 4054, 4106, 44172/97, 44217, 4252, 44529, 4536/80, 44598, 4601. New work: On 30/12 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42132/33 were complete, while No. 42134 had the frames and boiler erected. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40010/36, 40362, 40504/51/65, 40917, 42408, 58083. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41671, 43194, 43798, 43928, 47296, 47480, 47554, 47604 and ex-G.W.R. Nos. 2050, 2160 while Nos. 40928, 41053, 41120, 42326, 42509/33, 47634 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' No. 40741, unlined and lettered 'British Railways,' was on Works' trials on 30/12.
Withdrawn locomotives: On 30/12 No. 7058 was in the Works' yard, and No. 9588 had arrived for cutting up. Nos. 1247 and 3264 were cut up during W/E 24/12 and 31/12 respectively. Ex-G.W.R. No. 2137 was also cut up here during December.
SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/12/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 42132
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to St Albans (14C)
   
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hellifield (20G)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
11/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
18/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42132    

prev