Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 127 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6103 Week
» 12237 Month
» 240121 Year
» 1461686 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 42078 on 21/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 21/12/1950 to Dover Marine (74C)
Withdrawal Sat 18/06/1966
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 15 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
74C Dover Marine (New) 21/12/1950
6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 05/12/1959
6H Bangor w/e 17/06/1961
8C Speke Junction w/e 16/09/1961
8M Southport w/e 20/06/1964
8K Bank Hall w/e 11/06/1966
   Withdrawn 18/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 74C Dover Marine 21/12/1950
NEW 74C Dover Marine w/e 23/12/1950
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 8M Southport 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 5w/e 11/06/1966
WDN   w/e 18/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. SLS/196202
16/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. SLS/196202
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203
25/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: D2506, D3124, D5035/73/5/80/6, ED3, 12000/63, 42332/75, 47003, 47218, 47353, 47404/44/73/5, 48533, 58214, 73130, 75035. Gasworks : Nil, Roundhouse: M.R. 118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. New Paint Shop: D157, M.R. 1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650, 48081. Diesel Test House: D158. Outside Diesel Test House: 12051. Diesel Finishing Shop: D38, D159/60, D5081/2, D5145. New Erecting Shop: D161-70. Erecting Shop: D2213, D3052, D3578, D3843, 13117, 42078, 42327/43/81, 43953, 44112, 44279, 44304/87, 44416, 47165, 47293/5, 47325, 47441, 47515, 47653, 48105/8, 48609, 48763, 75048. Diesel Repair Shop: D10/98/9, D122/9, D2236, D2864, D2904/12, D5018/23/6/76, D5142/6, ED1, Shed Road: 41168, 42363, 42448, Awaiting Works: 42409, 47483, 47643. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 42078
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Dover Marine (74C)
   
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
11/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
18/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42078    

prev prev