Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 103 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6079 Week
» 12213 Month
» 240097 Year
» 1461662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 42063 on 20/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/12/1950 to Stoke (5D)
Withdrawal Sat 26/10/1963
Scrapping During 12/1963
Service Life 12 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5D Stoke (New) 20/12/1950
1C Watford 4w/e 19/05/1951
5D Stoke 4w/e 16/06/1951
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 03/10/1953
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 06/10/1956
27C Southport w/e 20/06/1959
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 16/02/1963
24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 11/05/1963
   Withdrawn 26/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5D Stoke w/e 23/12/1950
LOAN 1C Watford w/e 31/03/1951
EXLOAN 5D Stoke w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 27C Southport 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   w/e 26/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/12/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 42063
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Stoke (5D)
   
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
11/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
26/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42063    

prev prev