Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 29 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6005 Week
» 12139 Month
» 240023 Year
» 1461588 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 42061 on 08/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/12/1950 to Stoke (5D)
Withdrawal Sat 25/09/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965
Service Life 14 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5D Stoke (New) 08/12/1950
9G Northwich 4w/e 16/06/1951
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 17/07/1951
4A Bletchley 4w/e 29/12/1951
5D Stoke 4w/e 09/08/1952
1E Bletchley 4w/e 06/09/1952
11B Barrow in Furness 8w/e 19/06/1954
2A Rugby 4w/e 26/02/1955
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 30/07/1960
6A Chester (MR) w/e 14/01/1961
6H Bangor w/e 23/06/1962
27C Southport w/e 22/12/1962
   Withdrawn 25/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5D Stoke w/e 09/12/1950
LOAN 9G Northwich w/e 26/05/1951
LOAN 6A Chester (MR) w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 4A Bletchley 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 12/06/1954
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   w/e 25/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/12/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 42061
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Stoke (5D)
   
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (4A)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
30/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
25/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42061    

prev prev