Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3404 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34054 Week
» 132699 Month
» 335363 Year
» 3362216 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
41228 |
on |
30/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Tue 30/10/1948 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1964 |
Service Life |
15 yrs , 8 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/09/1958 |
Leamington Spa - Weedon |
Leamington Spa - Weedon branch last day, 13th September. 41227(2C) worked the 2-30 p.m. ex Weedon (from bay platform), 41228 (2C) the 2-57 p.m. ex-Leamington (the last through up train) and returned with the 6-14 p.m. ex-Northampton as last down train and 41218(2E) worked the 6-30 p.m. ex-Leamington to Napton returning empty stock in front of last train. |
SLS/195810 |
17/11/1958 |
Shed Closures |
Coventry, Hunstanton and Warwick sheds closed w.e.f. 17th, 3rd and 17th November respectively. Of the Warwick locos. 41227/8/85, 42566 an 48018 have been transferred to Leamington (GW) 84D. |
SLS/195812 |
27/12/1958 |
Warwick MPD |
Further to a recent note, 41227/8/85 an 42566 were officially transferred to W.R. 13th December, 1958, but on 20th December 42566 was transferred back to Rugby and its daily parcels turn was worked (from 22nd December) by 82031 (84G) until 9th January when Fowler 2-6-4T 42388 (87K-Swansea) appeared on this duty. |
SLS/195902 |
13/06/1959 |
Leamington Spa |
Former G.W. Railcars W13/4 are now allocated as parcels cars-they have seating removed. Three Ivatt 2-6-2Ts are still here viz. 41228/78/85 and relieve 42566 (when necessary) on the Nuneaton parcels roster. |
SLS/195909 |
31/10/1959 |
Leamington Spa |
The parcels rail-cars have recently been out of action and the replacement trains have been worked by 42566 (still with 2C plate !) which has worked over GW metals as far as Wolverhampton LL and Stourbridge June., being so noted in January. 42566's regular working to Nuneaton was taken over by 41228 (with 41285 as spare engine). |
SLS/196003 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 41228 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (84D) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
06/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
18/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
30/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
27/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
27/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41228 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|