Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 581 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31231 Week
» 129876 Month
» 332540 Year
» 3359393 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15560 |
on |
21/09/1932 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
61 |
on |
17/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40061 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 21/09/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/12/1959 off Heaton Mersey (9F) |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/01/1934 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/09/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15560 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
02/01/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
17/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40061 |
|
|
11/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
16/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (17E) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (17E) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40061 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|