Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3368 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34018 Week
» 132663 Month
» 335327 Year
» 3362180 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15520 |
on |
22/12/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
21 |
on |
06/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40021 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 22/12/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/09/1959 off Kentish Town (14B) |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
30/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
14B |
Kentish Town |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
LOAN |
68D |
Beattock |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
EXLOAN |
14B |
Kentish Town |
4w/e |
07/08/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/05/1933 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
04/11/1950 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/06/1950 |
Derby Works |
Engines into works: 21, 40556, 40671, 40925, 41016, 41052, 41070, 41086, 41096, 41900, 42311, 42503, 43267, 3298, 3399, 43800, 3900, 3961, 3985, 44122, 44174, 58075, 58189: |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15520 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
02/05/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
06/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 21 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40021 |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Beattock (68D) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40021 from Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|