Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1454 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32104 Week
» 130749 Month
» 333413 Year
» 3360266 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13223 |
on |
28/11/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2923 |
|
13/05/1935 |
British Railways |
42923 |
|
28/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
348 |
To Service |
Sat 28/11/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/01/1964 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13223 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
13/05/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2923 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42923 |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42923 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|