|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/08/1947 | Horwich Works | On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. | SLS/194710 |
31/10/1962 | Saltley MPD | 42053, 42284, 42707/84/90/823/7/900 are in store whilst 92167 (mechanical stoker) has been returned from the N.E.R.; on 20th October, 42791 (9G) was rostered to the Redditch-Alcester goods. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/10/1927 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13091 Built at Crewe Works |
||
16/08/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2791 | ||
22/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Manningham (20E) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Manningham (20E) | ||
27/08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42791 | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
08/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
14/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) | ||
27/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
11/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
05/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Manningham (20E) | ||
31/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
09/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42791 | ||
04/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |