Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2444 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33094 Week
» 131739 Month
» 334403 Year
» 3361256 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13018 |
on |
28/05/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2718 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
42718 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
84 |
To Service |
Sat 28/05/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 18/05/1963 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 29/06/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13018 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2718 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42718 |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
18/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42718 |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|