Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3569 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16975 Week
» 69991 Month
» 189518 Year
» 3216371 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46497 |
m/e |
02/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2189 |
To Service |
During 02/1952 to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/04/1965 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46497 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2189 Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hasland (18C) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hasland (18C) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
23/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K) |
|
|
24/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46497 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|