Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1883 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15289 Week
» 68305 Month
» 187832 Year
» 3214685 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46495 |
on |
30/01/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2187 |
To Service |
Sat 30/01/1952 to Kettering (15B) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/10/1966 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
15B |
Kettering |
w/e |
02/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
04/03/1961 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
01/06/1963 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
5w/e |
11/06/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46495 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2187 Allocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
04/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46495 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|