Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46465 |
m/e |
06/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2157 |
To Service |
During 06/1951 to Cambridge (31A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/03/1967 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
31A |
Cambridge |
on |
20/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
2w/e |
23/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
2w/e |
25/08/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1954 |
York Area |
The Holbeck (20A) turn to Scarborough mentioned in last month's notes has brought most of the Stanier Class 5 4-6-0's from Holbeck into York on various occasions; 73045 also appears frequently. 44810 (21A) appeared on it on 6/3/54. 44780 (25B) was under repair in York shed on 12/2/54. 61131 (37A) worked the 9.22 a.m. York to King's Cross as far as Doncaster on 12/2/54 instead of the customary Doncaster A3 or V2. 61131 returned to York at 1.26 p.m. on the 7.20 a.m. from Colchester. This latter train is normally hauled by a Doncaster B1, although V2's from New England are occasionally used instead. Two Scottish Region A3's called at York shed recently, returning north after overhaul at Doncaster Works, namely 60100 (64B) on 19/2/54 and 60095 (68E) on 3/3/54. 46465 (31A) was at York shed on 12/3/54, returning, to Cambridge after overhaul at Darlington Works. On 24/2/54 90145 (40B) arrived at York from the Hull via Market Weighton line hauling 69094 (53A) for Darlington Works. 67739 (32B) was also at York shed on the same date en route for Darlington Works in a very dilapidated condition. Pantomime excursions to Leeds were run on 2/3/54 from both Scarborough and Kirbymoorside. One of the two Scarborough trains called at Weaverthorpe, Rillington, Strensall and Haxby stations, which have been closed to regular passenger traffic for many years. The excursion from Kirbymoorside called at Nawton, Helmsley, Gilling and Coxwold (closed early in 1953). |
SLS/195404 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46465 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2157 Allocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
18/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46465 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|