Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1279 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14685 Week
» 67701 Month
» 187228 Year
» 3214081 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46461 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 06/1950 to St Margarets (64A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Thu 30/07/1964 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46461 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
27/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
30/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46461 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|