Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1037 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18840 Week
» 71856 Month
» 191383 Year
» 3218236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46453 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 04/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/04/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1950 |
20A |
|
Holbeck (MR) |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/04/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
20E |
Manningham |
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
4w/e |
17/04/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46453 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
16/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46453 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|