Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 871 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14277 Week
» 67293 Month
» 186820 Year
» 3213673 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46451 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 04/1950 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1966 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/05/1961 |
Sheffield Area |
Several of the 1Arge diesels (Brush and EE/RSH) allocated to Darnall (41A) are being stabled at Grimesthorpe temporarily owing to repair work at former shed. Grimesthorpe has two freight diagrams for Brush diesels, one of which works over the CLC line to Walton-on-the-Hill. 2-6-0s 46450/1 an 78023 transferred from Grimesthorpe to Millhouses are in store at rear of shed. It is understood that Grimesthorpe is not to become a Diesel Depot and will close as a Motive Power Depot this year. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46451 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46451 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|