Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 259 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7266 Week
» 13400 Month
» 241284 Year
» 1462849 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 46435 2w/e 14/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 2w/e Mon 14/01/1950 to Blackpool Central (24E)
Withdrawal w/e Mon 13/07/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Arnott Young (Troon)
Service Life 14 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24E Blackpool Central (New) 2w/e 14/01/1950
27C Southport 4w/e 17/07/1951
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 08/09/1951
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 06/10/1951
25A Wakefield 4w/e 29/01/1955
56F Low Moor w/e 14/11/1959
67B Hurlford 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 13/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 25/08/1951
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 22/09/1951
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 25A Wakefield 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   w/e 13/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/02/1955 Pontefract and Knottingley Nos. 46435 an 46483 have been transferred to Wakefield (25A) from Bank Hall (27A), having been displaced at the latter shed by the 78xxx series of BR Standard 2-6-0s. On 9th February both 46435 and 46483 were noted in the Pontefract and Knottingley area working on the former L. & Y. Leeds and Wakefield to Goole services, together with 46409/37/38. SLS/195504

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/01/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46435
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Blackpool Central (24E)
   
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
13/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 46435    

prev prev