Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 781 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14187 Week
» 67203 Month
» 186730 Year
» 3213583 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6416 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways |
46416 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 02/1947 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/04/1966 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1966 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1947 |
23A |
|
Bank Hall |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26D |
|
Bury |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
9K |
|
Bolton |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6416 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A) |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46416 |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46416 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|