Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4169 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17575 Week
» 70591 Month
» 190118 Year
» 3216971 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6413 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways |
46413 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 02/1947 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 18/10/1965 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6413 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46413 |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
18/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46413 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|