Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6409 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
46409 |
w/e |
16/09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 13/07/1964 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/02/1955 |
Pontefract and Knottingley |
Nos. 46435 an 46483 have been transferred to Wakefield (25A) from Bank Hall (27A), having been displaced at the latter shed by the 78xxx series of BR Standard 2-6-0s. On 9th February both 46435 and 46483 were noted in the Pontefract and Knottingley area working on the former L. & Y. Leeds and Wakefield to Goole services, together with 46409/37/38. |
SLS/195504 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6409 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
16/09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46409 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (53E) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
13/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46409 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon |
|
|