Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6408 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
46408 |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 26/10/1962 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1946 |
25C |
|
Goole |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
50F |
|
Malton |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25C |
Goole |
w/e |
21/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
50F |
Malton |
5w/e |
10/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6408 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Goole (25C) |
|
|
26/08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46408 |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
26/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46408 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|