|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/10/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 43149 Built at Doncaster Works |
||
07/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
14/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
22/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
22/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
11/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
31/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
19/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
09/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
14/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43149 | ||
02/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |