Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1517 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19320 Week
» 72336 Month
» 191863 Year
» 3218716 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43135 |
on |
31/12/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Mon 31/12/1951 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1966 |
Service Life |
14 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63D |
Fort William |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
30/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
2w/e |
07/10/1961 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
55B |
Stourton |
5w/e |
13/06/1964 |
ALLOC |
55F |
Manningham |
4w/e |
16/07/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1959 |
Midland & Great Northern Railway closure |
On 28th February the 1-45 p.m. Birmingham (New Street)-Yarmouth had Class 4F 44542 (17B) as far as Leicester where 43060 took over to Spalding; Restaurant car E668E was attached there too; the 9 a.m. Yarmouth-Birmingham New Street arrived behind 43036 (21A)'; the 4 p.m. Spalding-Nottingham was worked by 43058 (40F) and the 4-20 p.m. Nottingham-Kings Lynn by 43954 (16A), changed to 43061 (40F) at Bourne; the 4-20 p.m. Kings Lynn-Nottingham arrived at Bourne behind 43060 changing to 43954 and this was the last train going west from Bourne-43060 returned to Spalding with a goods. 43090 ran the 5-45 p.m. Kings Lynn-Peterboro' and 43135 the 8-37 p.m. Peterboro'-Melton Constable. At Yarmouth Beach, the S.M.'s bell tolled out for the last trains and at Norwich City the Reepham Parish Council gave the last diesel an official send-off just before midnight. Track demolition commenced immediately on the East Rudham-Melton and Sutton Bridge-South Lynn sections-the latter was double-track ! A daily goods now runs between Spalding and Bourne (diesel hauled) and serves also the Billingboro' branch (SK); similarly between South Lynn and East Rudham; two daily goods run between Spalding and Sutton Bridge and two between Melton Constable and Norwich City and between Peterboro' and Wisbech Harbour with an additional service between Peterboro' and Eye Green. The Saxby-South Witham section still has its 6 freights each way to and from the L.M.R. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43135 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fort William (63D) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
30/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
26/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43135 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|