Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2966 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33616 Week
» 132261 Month
» 334925 Year
» 3361778 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43036 |
on |
03/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Sat 03/06/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/05/1966 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1959 |
Midland & Great Northern Railway closure |
On 28th February the 1-45 p.m. Birmingham (New Street)-Yarmouth had Class 4F 44542 (17B) as far as Leicester where 43060 took over to Spalding; Restaurant car E668E was attached there too; the 9 a.m. Yarmouth-Birmingham New Street arrived behind 43036 (21A)'; the 4 p.m. Spalding-Nottingham was worked by 43058 (40F) and the 4-20 p.m. Nottingham-Kings Lynn by 43954 (16A), changed to 43061 (40F) at Bourne; the 4-20 p.m. Kings Lynn-Nottingham arrived at Bourne behind 43060 changing to 43954 and this was the last train going west from Bourne-43060 returned to Spalding with a goods. 43090 ran the 5-45 p.m. Kings Lynn-Peterboro' and 43135 the 8-37 p.m. Peterboro'-Melton Constable. At Yarmouth Beach, the S.M.'s bell tolled out for the last trains and at Norwich City the Reepham Parish Council gave the last diesel an official send-off just before midnight. Track demolition commenced immediately on the East Rudham-Melton and Sutton Bridge-South Lynn sections-the latter was double-track ! A daily goods now runs between Spalding and Bourne (diesel hauled) and serves also the Billingboro' branch (SK); similarly between South Lynn and East Rudham; two daily goods run between Spalding and Sutton Bridge and two between Melton Constable and Norwich City and between Peterboro' and Wisbech Harbour with an additional service between Peterboro' and Eye Green. The Saxby-South Witham section still has its 6 freights each way to and from the L.M.R. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/06/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43036 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
07/05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43036 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|