Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 900 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18703 Week
» 71719 Month
» 191246 Year
» 3218099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43022 |
on |
30/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Sat 30/12/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/11/1966 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43022 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
06/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43022 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|