Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1312 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19115 Week
» 72131 Month
» 191658 Year
» 3218511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13272 |
on |
15/01/1934 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2972 |
|
05/02/1936 |
British Railways |
42972 |
|
09/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P5F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
140 |
To Service |
Sat 15/01/1934 to Willesden (1A) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 17/04/1965 off Gorton (9G) |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
01/12/1962 |
ALLOC |
21B |
Bescot |
4w/e |
30/03/1963 |
ALLOC |
9G |
Gorton |
5w/e |
09/01/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/01/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13272 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 140 Allocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
08/04/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (28C) |
|
|
27/04/1935 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Motherwell (28A) |
|
|
06/07/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
05/02/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2972 |
|
|
21/11/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
21/02/1942 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
28/08/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
27/10/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
20/07/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42972 |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42972 from Gorton (9G) |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|