Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1298 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19101 Week
» 72117 Month
» 191644 Year
» 3218497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13271 |
on |
10/01/1934 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2971 |
4w/e |
31/12/1935 |
British Railways |
42971 |
|
17/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P5F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
139 |
To Service |
Sat 10/01/1934 to Edge Hill (8A) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/12/1964 off Nuneaton (5E) |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/01/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13271 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 139 Allocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
27/01/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
08/04/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (28C) |
|
|
1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
01/06/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
31/12/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2971 |
|
|
03/10/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
25/09/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
25/11/1939 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
12/10/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
17/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42971 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
09/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E) |
|
|
19/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42971 from Nuneaton (5E) |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|