|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/08/1947 | Horwich Works | On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/01/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13270 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 138 Allocated to Aston (3D) |
||
27/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
20/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
13/06/1935 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2970 | ||
15/06/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
09/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
09/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
19/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
03/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) | ||
25/09/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
02/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
17/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
16/12/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42970 | ||
04/07/1959 | Allocation | Loaned to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
12/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) | ||
16/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
05/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) | ||
26/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E) | ||
24/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42970 from Nuneaton (5E) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |