Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3927 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17333 Week
» 70349 Month
» 189876 Year
» 3216729 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13257 |
on |
23/12/1933 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2957 |
|
29/03/1935 |
British Railways |
42957 |
|
12/02/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
26/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
13/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
3D |
Aston |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
21B |
Bescot |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
2K |
Bushbury |
4w/e |
08/08/1964 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Oxley |
4w/e |
08/05/1965 |
ALLOC |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
5w/e |
08/01/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13257 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 125 Allocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
13/10/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
29/03/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2957 |
|
|
26/04/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
13/12/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42957 |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (2K) |
|
|
04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42957 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|