Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1680 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15086 Week
» 68102 Month
» 187629 Year
» 3214482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13248 |
on |
10/11/1933 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2948 |
|
30/08/1935 |
British Railways |
42948 |
|
02/10/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/11/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13248 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 116 Allocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
13/07/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
30/08/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2948 |
|
|
26/10/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
28/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
22/01/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
04/06/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
13/08/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
17/08/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (7B) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42948 |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
26/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
05/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
08/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42948 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|