Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 374 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3965 Week
» 14100 Month
» 330331 Year
» 841433 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (1st) 13245   21/10/1933
LMS (1934) 2945   14/12/1934
BR 42945   10/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 21/10/1933
Withdrawal Sat 26/03/1966 off Heaton Mersey (9F)
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 32 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A.1 (New) 21/10/1933
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/06/1935
12D Workington w/e 13/07/1935
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 03/07/1937
12D Workington w/e 22/01/1938
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/09/1939
12D Workington w/e 23/11/1940
5B Crewe South w/e 24/01/1942
8A Edge Hill w/e 07/11/1942
6B Mold Junction w/e 26/12/1942
7B Bangor w/e 20/05/1944
7A Llandudno Junction w/e 08/07/1944
6B Mold Junction w/e 09/09/1944
24K Preston w/e 23/04/1960
2B Nuneaton w/e 09/09/1961
9G Gorton w/e 11/1964
9F Heaton Mersey w/e 05/1965
   Withdrawn 26/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24K Preston 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 26/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1933 To Service To service as LMS Number 13245
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Durran Hill (Carlisle) (12a)
   
14/12/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 2945    
15/06/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
13/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
03/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
22/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
16/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
23/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
24/01/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
07/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
26/12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
20/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (7B)    
08/07/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
09/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
10/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42945    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (24K)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Yard RO 1/1965 Link
05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
26/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42945 from Heaton Mersey (9F)    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev