Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2712 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16118 Week
» 69134 Month
» 188661 Year
» 3215514 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
316 |
|
11/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10831 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50831 |
|
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
36 |
Works Number |
622 |
To Service |
During 11/1898 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1958 |
Service Life |
60 yrs |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
02/06/1959 |
Locomotives Sold |
On 2nd June L. & Y. 50818/31/55/65 were removed from Badnall Wharf to Messrs. A. Looms, Spondon, Derby. On 8th June Compounds 41078 an 41156 and Class 3F 43419 an 43631 were removed to Messrs. Steel and Co. Ltd., Coatbridge Iron Works, Whifflet, Lanarks. |
SLS/195907 |
08/08/1959 |
Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T (Albert Looms Yard) |
Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. |
SLS/195910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 316 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 622 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10831 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50831 |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50831 |
|
|