Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17918 Week
» 70934 Month
» 190461 Year
» 3217314 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1390 |
|
07/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10806 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50806 |
|
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
35 |
Works Number |
594 |
To Service |
During 07/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/02/1952 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1390 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 594 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10806 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50806 |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50806 |
|
|