Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 336 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18139 Week
» 71155 Month
» 190682 Year
» 3217535 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1388 |
|
07/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10804 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50804 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
35 |
Works Number |
592 |
To Service |
During 07/1898 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1950 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1388 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 592 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10804 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 50804 but not taken up |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10804 |
|
|