Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4921 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20533 Week
» 119178 Month
» 321842 Year
» 3348695 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1383 |
|
06/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10799 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50799 |
|
06/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
34 |
Works Number |
587 |
To Service |
During 06/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/08/1952 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1383 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 587 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10799 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
18/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
15/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
17/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
06/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50799 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
16/08/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50799 |
|
|